This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 07/31/2021 at 18:05:31 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank NA v. Tracy Pollack et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Wells Fargo Bank NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Tracy Pollack. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **5940

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Defendants

Tracy Pollack

Tracy A Pollack

Tracy A Crosby

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE REPORT & JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE REPORT & JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION/EXHIBITS

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION/EXHIBITS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COSTS OF PLANTIFF

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COSTS OF PLANTIFF; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ/JUD INTERVENTION

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ/JUD INTERVENTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LIS PENDENS DOC# LP2017-107

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LIS PENDENS DOC# LP2017-107; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INDX # APPL

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INDX # APPL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2021; Received: 07/30/2021

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2021; Received: 07/30/2021

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2021; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2021; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE REPORT & JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION/EXHIBITS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COSTS OF PLANTIFF; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MOTION SLIP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ/JUD INTERVENTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REDACTION COVER PAGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LIS PENDENS DOC# LP2017-107; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INDX # APPL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less