This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:24:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. v. RANDALL R RATAJCZAK et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RANDALL R RATAJCZAK. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0469

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

Defendants

Randall R Ratajczak

Cathy Ann Ratajczak A/K/A CATHY ANN RATAJCZAK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

MULLEN, RICHARD S

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected* Filed by CAB - 20190698

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected* Filed by CAB - 20190698; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #1) Supporting Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #1) Supporting Documents; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C EXHIBIT A, EXHIBIT B, EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C EXHIBIT A, EXHIBIT B, EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected* Filed by CAB - 20190698; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #1) Supporting Documents; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by MXT, 20190698; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-C EXHIBIT A, EXHIBIT B, EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less