This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:46:15 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - v. - Melvin J Griffin et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Melvin J Griffin. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0093

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Melvin J Griffin

Sandra D Griffin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNORS, MARY MCAULEY

Attorney at Harris Beach, PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service of Mailing; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment & Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment & Order; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

AFFIRMATION Sandra Non-Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Sandra Non-Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

AFFIRMATION Melvin Non-Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Melvin Non-Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Invoices; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment based on Order

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment based on Order; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint with AOS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint with AOS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Sandra D. Griffin

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Sandra D. Griffin; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 07/01/2017; Received: 07/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Melvin J. Griffin

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Melvin J. Griffin; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 07/01/2017; Received: 07/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service of Mailing; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment & Order; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Sandra Non-Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Melvin Non-Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Invoices; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment based on Order; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Mischele R. Boston; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint with AOS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Sandra D. Griffin; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 07/01/2017; Received: 07/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Melvin J. Griffin; Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 07/01/2017; Received: 07/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Connors, M.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less