This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 17:17:51 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., - v. - LOUIS MARCELIN A/K/A LOUIS GEUNE MARCELIN et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A , filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LOUIS MARCELIN A/K/A LOUIS GEUNE MARCELIN. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.,

Defendants

TOMEKA VOLCY A/K/A TOMEKA T. VOLCY A/K/A TOMEKA TRACIA VOLCY, AS VOLUNTARY ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF JEAN BERTHONY VLOCY A/K/A JEAN BERTHONY VOLCY A/K/A JEAN-BERTHONY VOLCY A/K/A JEANBERTHONY VOLCY

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

JOHN DOE

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SERVICES OF NYC

WELLS FARGO BANK, N/A.,

WACHOVIA BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Zvi A Storch

CITY OF NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

LOUIS MARCELIN A/K/A LOUIS GEUNE MARCELIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Defendant Attorneys

STORCH, ZVI A

NAGHDI, MOSHE HAIM

 

Court Documents

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #2) and default judgment, amend caption, etc

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #2) and default judgment, amend caption, etc; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 12/12/19 nsp.

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 12/12/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by RTK - 20182044

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by RTK - 20182044; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MARIO LALAM AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MARIO LALAM AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-PAUL DOE (REF. LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #4

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-PAUL DOE (REF. LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #4; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #7

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #7; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #2) and default judgment, amend caption, etc; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dtd 12/12/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Filed by RTK - 20182044; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT dmb 20182044 NMSC; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JANE DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #5; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #3; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-MARIO LALAM AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-PAUL DOE (REF. LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #4; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JOHN DOE (REF. NAME) AS JOHN DOE #7; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/01/2018; Received: 06/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less