This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:46:49 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. - v. - JEREMY L. BERNTHON et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JEREMY L BERNTHON. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1223

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

Jeremy L. Bernthon A/K/A JEREMY BERNTHON

John Doe STRICKEN BY ORDER

Kimberly A. Kline A/K/A KIMBERLY A. BERNTHON A/K/A KIMBERLY BERNTHON

EMPOWER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHENANGO INC. A NON-PROFIT CORPORATION, MILDAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN NY AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE LLC

Not Yet Classified

Frank M Como ESQ Referee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

MUNIAN, VICTORIA ELIZABETH

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

MULLEN, RICHARD S

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

COMO, FRANK MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Como, F.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

NOTICE OF SALE 20171396\CTA

NOTICE OF SALE 20171396\CTA; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) filed by DAW WOG:20171396

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) filed by DAW WOG:20171396; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION NOW DATED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION NOW DATED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 02/04/2019; Received: 02/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Como, F.; Filed: 01/17/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE 20171396\CTA; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2018; Received: 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) filed by DAW WOG:20171396; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION NOW DATED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/13/2018; Received: 07/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - t (Motion #2) additional exhibits; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 07/12/2018; Received: 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mullen, R. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Munian, V. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less