This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 13:41:36 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. - v. - DIANA D. STENZEL et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DIANA D STENZEL. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

Michael L Stenzel II

Diana Stenzel AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL L. STENZEL AKA MICHAEL STENZEL

ESTATE OF MICHAEL L STENZEL

Michael Stenzel

Diana D Stenzel AKA DIANA STENZEL

NIAGARA COUNTY PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

NIAGARA COUNTY DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRAUSS, LAURA MARIE

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

PASCUZZI, ASHLEY MARIE

Defendant Attorney

Andrews, Kyle R

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

TERMS OF SALE Affidavits, NOS and Invoices

TERMS OF SALE Affidavits, NOS and Invoices; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT BILL OF COSTS - CLERK STAMP

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT BILL OF COSTS - CLERK STAMP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #1)

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

COURT NOTICE (Motion #1)

COURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL 3215 AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL 3215 AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NIAGARA DEPT SOCIAL AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NIAGARA DEPT SOCIAL AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PUBLIC ADMIN NIAGARA AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PUBLIC ADMIN NIAGARA AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTERMS OF SALE Affidavits, NOS and Invoices; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT BILL OF COSTS - CLERK STAMP; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DIANA 3215 AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL 3215 AOM; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NIAGARA DEPT SOCIAL AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PUBLIC ADMIN NIAGARA AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less