Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 16:32:40 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - v. - Charles C. Dyson et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Charles C Dyson. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********45CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

DYSON CHARLES being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortgaged premises

Charles C Dyson a/k/a Charles Dyson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to discontinue Action

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to discontinue Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to discontinue Action; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less