This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 11:20:57 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. v. AKIL SEVORWELL et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AKIL SEVORWELL. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF GIACOMO LANE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

John Doe

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Akil Sevorwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

Attorney at Calamar

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

PUSCHECK, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

Defendant Attorneys

MOTELSON, MICHAEL JON

Attorney at MICHAEL J. MOTELSON ESQ.

SCHWARTZ, BETH PATRICIA

Attorney at U S ATTORNEY EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Schwartz, B.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Motelson, M.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVE ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVE ... show more; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AKIL SEVORWELL AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AKIL SEVORWELL AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AKIL SEVORWELL 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AKIL SEVORWELL 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PVB

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PVB; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Schwartz, B.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Motelson, M.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/ UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF GIACOMO LANE HOA AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AKIL SEVORWELL AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AKIL SEVORWELL 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC PVB; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less