This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 02:18:44 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. - v. - ADOLFO ESPOSITO et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ADOLFO ESPOSITO. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendants

Nancy Esposito

Adolfo Esposito

COMMERCE BANK, N.A.

Not Yet Classified

Alexia Capote Intervenor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

RICCIARDI, JOHN JOSEPH

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

ROSENFELD, STEVEN

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

PITNELL, ANTHONY LOUIS

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

SMITH, JESSICA BRITTANY

Attorney at Erie County Medical Center

EISENBERG, ROSS

Attorney at Hasbani & Light P.C.

Defendant Attorney

TISCHLER, PERRY I

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PERRY I. TISCHLER

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CAPOTE, ALEXIA JOSEFINA

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

ORDER - OTHER Order of Distribution

ORDER - OTHER Order of Distribution; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Request for Appellate Division Intervention

EXHIBIT(S) - A Request for Appellate Division Intervention; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - K Ten Day Notice to Quit

EXHIBIT(S) - K Ten Day Notice to Quit; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADOLFO ESPOSITO AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADOLFO ESPOSITO AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOE AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY EPOSITO 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY EPOSITO 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY ESPOSITO AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY ESPOSITO AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMERCE BANK, N.A. NKA TD BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMERCE BANK, N.A. NKA TD BANK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Order of Distribution; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Request for Appellate Division Intervention; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K Ten Day Notice to Quit; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Tischler, P.; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADOLFO ESPOSITO 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADOLFO ESPOSITO AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOE AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY EPOSITO 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NANCY ESPOSITO AOS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMERCE BANK, N.A. NKA TD BANK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less