This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:02:00 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, INC. - v. - ELIZABETH LLANES et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ELIZABETH LLANES. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, INC.

Defendants

Belinda Llanes A/K/A BELINA LLANES

John Doe # 1 THROUGH AND INCLUDING JOHN DOE#25

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

THE DEFENDANTS LAST NAMED IN QUOTATION MARKS BEING INTENDED TO DESIGNATE TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION OF THE HEREIN DESCRIBED PREMISES OR PORTIONS THEREOF, IF ANY THERE BE, SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, THEIR TRUE NAME BEING UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF

Elizabeth Llanes

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC A/A/O CAVALRY SPV I LLC AAO CITIBANK US NA

CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROTH, GERALD C

Attorney at STEIN WIENER & ROTH L.L.P.

SAMBURSKY, ROBERT C

Attorney at STEIN, WIENER & ROTH, LLP ATTORNEYS AT LAW

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - b filed lis pendens

EXHIBIT(S) - b filed lis pendens; Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - a filed summons

EXHIBIT(S) - a filed summons; Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sambursky, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Sambursky, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 3 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 3 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSETTI LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 2 1303

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSETTI LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 2 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JASON LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JASON LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 1; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSETTI LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSETTI LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 2; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 3

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 3; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC A/A/O CAVALRY SPV I LLC AAO CITIBANK US NA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC A/A/O CAVALRY SPV I LLC AAO CITIBANK US NA; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b filed lis pendens; Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a filed summons; Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Roth, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sambursky, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Sambursky, R. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 3 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSETTI LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 2 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JASON LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 1 1303; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BELINDA LLANES A/K/A BELINA LLANES; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JASON LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 1; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROSETTI LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 2; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL LLANES S/H/A JOHN DOE 3; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC A/A/O CAVALRY SPV I LLC AAO CITIBANK US NA; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Roth, G. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less