This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:28:19 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE F/K/A NORWEST BANK MINNESOTA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR DELTA FUNDING HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 1999-1 - v. - GESUALDA BUETI et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A , SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA, N A , AS TRUSTEE F/K/A NORWEST BANK MINNESOTA, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR DELTA FUNDING HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 1999-1 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GESUALDA BUETI. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE F/K/A NORWEST BANK MINNESOTA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR DELTA FUNDING HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 1999-1

Defendants

Gesualda Bueti

Carmela Bueti

Dominic A. Bueti

CAPITAL QUEST LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY

JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Accurint search for ROCCO BUETI

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Accurint search for ROCCO BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Title Report

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Title Report; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Satisfaction of Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Satisfaction of Mortgage; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Payment History

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Payment History; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Note and Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Note and Mortgage; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GESUALDA BUETI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GESUALDA BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DOMINIC A. BUETI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DOMINIC A. BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CARMELA BUETI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CARMELA BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CAPITAL QUEST LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CAPITAL QUEST LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DECLARATORY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Accurint search for ROCCO BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Title Report; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Satisfaction of Mortgage; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Payment History; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Note and Mortgage; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency, Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GESUALDA BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DOMINIC A. BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CARMELA BUETI; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CAPITAL QUEST LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less