This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 12:41:28 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2002-5, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2002-5 - v. - PETER M. PERGOLA et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2002-5, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2002-5 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PETER M PERGOLA. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2002-5, ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2002-5

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Peter M. Pergola

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

PACKAGE PAVEMENT COMPANY, INCORPORATED

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #12 the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Subjec

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

NATURE'S TREES, INC.

NES RENTALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

BOONE, JACQUELINE NICOLE

Attorney at BOONE LAW, PLLC.

GREER, JEFFREY S.

Attorney at LEWIS & GREER PC

GARY, CHARLES EDWARD

Attorney at NYS Office of the Attorney General

ZEBROWSKI, KATHLEEN A

Attorney at U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U S ATTORNEYS OFFICE

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Gary, C.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Zebrowski, K.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos NES Rentals Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos NES Rentals Inc.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

ANSWER Verified.Answer.Peter.M.Pergola

ANSWER Verified.Answer.Peter.M.Pergola; Filed By: Boone, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Boone, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES Notice of Appearance and Claims to Surplus Monies

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES Notice of Appearance and Claims to Surplus Monies; Filed By: Greer, J.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON DONNA PERGOLA AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON DONNA PERGOLA AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON DONNA PERGOLA S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON DONNA PERGOLA S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON PETER M. PERGOLA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON PETER M. PERGOLA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON PETER M. PERGOLA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON PETER M. PERGOLA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Gary, C.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Zebrowski, K.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos NES Rentals Inc.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified.Answer.Peter.M.Pergola; Filed By: Boone, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Boone, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES Notice of Appearance and Claims to Surplus Monies; Filed By: Greer, J.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON SAVATREE LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON DONNA PERGOLA AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON DONNA PERGOLA S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 ON PETER M. PERGOLA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON PETER M. PERGOLA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less