Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:54:35 (UTC).

WAYNE R KOSHOFER et al - v. - A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO., et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 WAYNE R KOSHOFER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO . This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wayne R Koshofer

Defendants

ABB, INC.

GOULDS PUMPS LLC,

CRANE CO.,

SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., successor in interest to

CRANE CO.

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. formerly known as

BMCE INC., f/k/a UNITED CENTRIFUGAL PUMP

ITT LLC.,

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

BRYANT HEATING & COOLING SYSTEMS

GOULD ELECTRONICS INC

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., as successor in interest

LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO., INC

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.,

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FULLER, BRETT FREDERICK

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy

ALVARADO, PHAN THI

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG

Defendant Attorneys

CURTIS, MICHAEL JAMES

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

COTTLE, ERIC R

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

PEHUSH, TARA LYNNE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

POWERS, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

KIM, MORAE

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

GUERRERO, ROSA GUADALUPE

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau

LASALA, JOSEPH P

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH & MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

RUGGERI, SAM VICTOR

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Other Attorneys

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

CALCAGNO, TERANCE ROWE

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

MACSTEEL, GENEVIEVE

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

PRELVUKAJ, ARIAN

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry, Stip and Cert of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry, Stip and Cert of Service; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Eaton's Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Eaton's Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Macsteel, G.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Gould Electronics Inc. and ABB Inc. Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Gould Electronics Inc. and ABB Inc. Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Powers, N.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance and Affidavit

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance and Affidavit; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) ITT LLC

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) ITT LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Allen Bradley's Executed Stip of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Allen Bradley's Executed Stip of Discontinuance; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance w/prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance w/prejudice; Filed By: Pehush, T.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #005) Defendant GEI's Withdrawal of Motion for an Order Barring Plaintiffs' Claims for Punitive Damages ag ... show more

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #005) Defendant GEI's Withdrawal of Motion for an Order Barring Plaintiffs' Claims for Punitive Damages ag ... show more; Filed By: Guerrero, R.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Pfizer's Acknowledgment of Service

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Pfizer's Acknowledgment of Service; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt of Eaton Corporation

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt of Eaton Corporation; Filed By: Ferstendig, G.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Gould Electronics Inc., Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Gould Electronics Inc., Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kim, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry, Stip and Cert of Service; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Eaton's Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Macsteel, G.; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Gould Electronics Inc. and ABB Inc. Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Powers, N.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance and Affidavit; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) ITT LLC; Filed By: Hughes, B.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Allen Bradley's Executed Stip of Discontinuance; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Crane Co.'s Stipulation of Discontinuance w/prejudice; Filed By: Pehush, T.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #005) Defendant GEI's Withdrawal of Motion for an Order Barring Plaintiffs' Claims for Punitive Damages against GEI; Filed By: Guerrero, R.; Filed: 10/04/2019; Received: 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Peerless - Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer; Filed By: O'Rourke, P.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Pfizer's Acknowledgment of Service; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt of Eaton Corporation; Filed By: Ferstendig, G.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Gould Electronics Inc., Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kim, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less