This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 21:05:49 (UTC).

Washington Ave Endicott Associates, LLC v. Finders Keeperz LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Washington Ave Endicott Associates, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Finders Keeperz LLC. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Cawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2904

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph F Cawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Washington Ave Endicott Associates, LLC

Defendants

Finders Keeperz LLC

Pamela Henderson

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTON, DANIEL ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

MACK, JARED RICHARD

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 09/02/2022; Received: 09/02/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2022; Received: 08/31/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/29/2022; Received: 08/29/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #3)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #3) Costs of Plaintiff

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #3) Costs of Plaintiff; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Affirmation re: Attorney's Fees

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Affirmation re: Attorney's Fees; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #3) Referee's Oath and Report

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #3) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Attorney Daniel Norton

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Attorney Daniel Norton; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of Pleadings; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notices of Default and Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notices of Default and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Attorney Daniel Norton

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Attorney Daniel Norton; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 09/02/2022; Received: 09/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/31/2022; Received: 08/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/29/2022; Received: 08/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #3) Costs of Plaintiff; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Affirmation re: Attorney's Fees; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #3) Referee's Oath and Report; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Attorney Daniel Norton; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 08/24/2022; Received: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit of Louis Bertoni; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of Pleadings; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notices of Default and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Attorney Daniel Norton; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/25/2022; Received: 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 01/21/2022; Received: 01/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Norton, D.; Filed: 12/07/2021; Received: 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less