This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 20:04:07 (UTC).

Wal-Mart Real Estate Trust #5240 - v. - Tompkins County Department of Assessment

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Wal-Mart Real Estate Trust 5240 filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Tompkins County Department of Assessment. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0139

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wal-Mart Real Estate Trust #5240

Defendant

Tompkins County Department of Assessment

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAVITSKY, BRUCE J

Attorney at STAVITSKY & ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant Attorney

STUMBAR, L RICHARD

Attorney at SCHLATHER, STUMBAR, PARKS & SALK LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stumbar, L; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT LIST-TO JUDGE MCBRIDE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT LIST-TO JUDGE MCBRIDE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Stumbar, L; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) NOTICE OF PETITION WITH RETURN DATE

NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) NOTICE OF PETITION WITH RETURN DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER RJI, Notice of Petition and Petition

RJI -RE: OTHER RJI, Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) NOP

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) NOP; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

PETITION Petition

PETITION Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stumbar, L; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT LIST-TO JUDGE MCBRIDE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Stumbar, L; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) NOTICE OF PETITION WITH RETURN DATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER RJI, Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) NOP; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Petition; Filed By: Stavitsky, B.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less