This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:09:01 (UTC).

VLADMIR GRIGORYAN - v. - MARIE ESTELLE CHIODO et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 VLADMIR GRIGORYAN filed an Other lawsuit against MARIE ESTELLE CHIODO. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vladmir Grigoryan

Defendants

Marie estelle Chiodo

Donald J. Chiodo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRAKHIN, YURIY

Defendant Attorney

GRGAS, STEVEN

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 02/10/2018; Received: 02/10/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 10/19/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 10/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 9/21/17

ORDER - OTHER dated 9/21/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Revis, S.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Revis, S.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opp to Plaintiff's Liab SJM

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opp to Plaintiff's Liab SJM; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Prakhin, Y. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 02/10/2018; Received: 02/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 10/19/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 9/21/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Revis, S.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Revis, S.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opp to Plaintiff's Liab SJM; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Grgas, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Prakhin, Y. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Prakhin, Y.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less