Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 17:12:15 (UTC).

Vitaliy Grigoryan et al - v. - 108 Chambers Street Owner, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 Vitaliy Grigoryan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 108 Chambers Street Owner, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vitaliy Grigoryan

Marina Stasiva

Defendants and Petitioners

108 Chambers Street Owner, LLC

Ross & Associates, LLC

108 Chambers Street Construction Manager, LLC

Best Mechanical Services, Inc.

Rightway Plumbing and Heating, Inc.

Respondent

Integral Power & Control Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON, JOEL H

Attorney at Robinson and Yablon PC

Petitioner Attorney

LAURA J. O'NEILL EDWARD J. O'GORMAN

Defendant Attorneys

MISK, GERARD N

Attorney at GINSBURG & MISK

O'NEILL, LAURA J.

Attorney at Pillinger Miller & Tarallo

O'GORMAN, EDWARD J.

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO LLP

MILLER, JEFFREY T

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO, LLP

Respondent Attorney

ALAN R MELLER (Y43L59152) IOANA WENCHELL

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Trade Contractor Agreement

EXHIBIT(S)

Oath Hearing Officer Decision

EXHIBIT(S)

TT's EBT Transcript pt 3

EXHIBIT(S)

TT's EBT Transcript pt 2

EXHIBIT(S)

TT's EBT Transcript pt 1

EXHIBIT(S)

EBT Transcript-Maxsim Stasiva

EXHIBIT(S)

EBT Transcript--Def Best Mechanical

EXHIBIT(S)

NYC DOB Best Violation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS - Rightway Plumbing & Heating

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS - Ross & Associates

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS - Construction Manager

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS - Owner

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 11 Trade Contractor Agreement; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 10 Oath Hearing Officer Decision; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 TT's EBT Transcript pt 3; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 TT's EBT Transcript pt 2; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 TT's EBT Transcript pt 1; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 EBT Transcript-Maxsim Stasiva; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 EBT Transcript--Def Best Mechanical; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 NYC DOB Best Violation; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Incident Report; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S); Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 01/26/2018; Received: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Rightway Plumbing & Heating; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Ross & Associates; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Construction Manager; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Owner; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Robinson, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less