This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/12/2020 at 19:51:03 (UTC).

Visions Federal Credit Union - v. - Richard Desmond

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Visions Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Richard Desmond. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Tait. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2502

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Tait

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Visions Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Richard Desmond

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS, WILLIAM MILES

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT WARRANT SIGNED FILED 2/10/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT WARRANT SIGNED FILED 2/10/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SHERIFFS RETURN ON ARREST

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SHERIFFS RETURN ON ARREST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

WARRANT (COPY)

WARRANT (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of service of amended order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of service of amended order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Amended Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Amended Order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #3)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #3); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1) Amended Order regarding Contempt

ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1) Amended Order regarding Contempt; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/08/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Loanliner Credit and Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Loanliner Credit and Security Agreement; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Signature Sale Rel Bldr 60 Loan Statement and Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Signature Sale Rel Bldr 60 Loan Statement and Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT WARRANT SIGNED FILED 2/10/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SHERIFFS RETURN ON ARREST; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT (COPY); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of service of amended order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Amended Order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #3); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1) Amended Order regarding Contempt; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/19/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Loanliner Credit and Security Agreement; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Signature Sale Rel Bldr 60 Loan Statement and Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less