This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 03:29:19 (UTC).

Visions Federal Credit Union v. Jennifer L Cummings et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Visions Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer L Cummings. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Tait. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0166

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Tait

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Visions Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Jennifer L Cummings

Jennifer Hyde

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS, WILLIAM MILES

Attorney at ASWAD AND INGRAHAM, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Svc by Mail

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Svc by Mail; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) SCRA and Supplemental Service Info

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) SCRA and Supplemental Service Info; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION RJI

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION RJI; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment and Order

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment and Order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

BILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs

BILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Default Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - E Default Judgment; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Pennsylvania Judgment Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - D Pennsylvania Judgment Documents; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service by Mail

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Bucks County Sheriff Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B Bucks County Sheriff Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice and Complaint for Bucks County, PA Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice and Complaint for Bucks County, PA Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affidavit in Support of Motion for SJILC Based on a Judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affidavit in Support of Motion for SJILC Based on a Judgment; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI Summons

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI Summons; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Svc by Mail; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) SCRA and Supplemental Service Info; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Supplemental Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION RJI; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment and Order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Default Judgment; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Pennsylvania Judgment Documents; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Bucks County Sheriff Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice and Complaint for Bucks County, PA Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affidavit in Support of Motion for SJILC Based on a Judgment; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI Summons; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less