This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/12/2020 at 19:50:47 (UTC).

Visions Federal Credit Union - v. - Cynthia Washington

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 Visions Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cynthia Washington. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Eugene D Faughnan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2506

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Eugene D Faughnan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Visions Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Cynthia Washington

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS, WILLIAM MILES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Special Signature Rel Bldr 60 Loan Statement and Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Special Signature Rel Bldr 60 Loan Statement and Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Loanliner Credit and Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Loanliner Credit and Security Agreement; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Judgment and Order

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Judgment and Order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Application for Default Judgment

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Application for Default Judgment; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) SCRA Search Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) SCRA Search Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of Costs

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of Costs; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) RJI

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) RJI; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING - SUFFOLK COUNTY

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING - SUFFOLK COUNTY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING - SUFFOLK COUNTY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) RJI; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of Costs; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) SCRA Search Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Application for Default Judgment; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Judgment and Order; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/27/2018; Received: 12/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Loanliner Credit and Security Agreement; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Special Signature Rel Bldr 60 Loan Statement and Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Thomas, W.; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less