Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:25:07 (UTC).

VINCENTO DEPALMA et al v. WESTERN NEW YORK UROLOGY ASSOCIATES et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 VINCENTO DEPALMA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WESTERN NEW YORK UROLOGY ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Burns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Burns

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vincento Depalma

Jeannine Depalma

Defendants

MOUNT ST. MARY'S HOSPITAL

Brian D. Rambarren M.D.

WESTERN NEW YORK UROLOGY ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANDETTE, JAMES MICHAEL

Attorney at VanDette Penberthy LLP

Defendant Attorneys

VISCO, JOHN MICHAEL

GRUBER, JOHN MARK

Attorney at ROACH BROWN MCCARTHY & GRUBER, PC

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of med mal

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of med mal; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Svc. WNY Urology

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Svc. WNY Urology; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Rambarran

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Rambarran; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Mt. St. Marys

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Mt. St. Marys; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Gruber, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of med mal; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Svc. WNY Urology; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Rambarran; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Mt. St. Marys; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Gruber, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Visco, J.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Vandette, J.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less