This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 00:34:07 (UTC).

Victor Marte v. Denis A Evans et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Victor Marte filed an Other lawsuit against Denis A Evans. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John R Higgitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John R Higgitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Marte

Defendants

Al-Lee Installations Inc.

Alfredo E Guerrero

Denis A Evans

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUSENBOLD, SCOTT R

Attorney at Law Offices of Scott R. Housenbold

Defendant Attorneys

SHOWERS, ANDREW DOWNING

Attorney at MCMAHON, MARTINE & GALLAGHER, LLP

SMITH, BRIAN STEPHEN

Attorney at McMahon, Martine & Gallagher LLP

DAVYDOV, KATERINA

Attorney at James F. Butler & Associates

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Judgment with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Judgment with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 2/14/20

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 2/14/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT COSTS IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT-ALFREDO E. GUERRERO ONLY.

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT COSTS IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT-ALFREDO E. GUERRERO ONLY.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER OF JOINT TRIAL DATED 1/31/2020

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER OF JOINT TRIAL DATED 1/31/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment with Notice of Settlement

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment with Notice of Settlement; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 01/08/2020

ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 01/08/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Smith, B.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Guerrero Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Guerrero Pleadings; Filed By: Smith, B.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Showers, A.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-claim and Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-claim and Demands; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Judgment with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 2/14/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT COSTS IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT-ALFREDO E. GUERRERO ONLY.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #004) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER OF JOINT TRIAL DATED 1/31/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment with Notice of Settlement; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 01/08/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Smith, B.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Guerrero Pleadings; Filed By: Smith, B.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Marte Pleadings; Filed By: Smith, B.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Showers, A.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Showers, A.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-claim and Demands; Filed By: Davydov, K.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/26/2019; Received: 02/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Housenbold, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less