Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 21:04:16 (UTC).

Victor F. Baron Sr. et al - v. - Jack R. Saia D.C. et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 Victor F Baron Sr filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Jack R Saia D C. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Karen Baron

Victor F. Baron SR.

Defendants

Simply Chiropractic Amherst, PLLC

Jack R. Saia D.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOWEY, BRIAN KEVIN

TUCCI, MICHAEL ROBERT

Attorney at Stamm Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

HULSLANDER, KEVIN E

Attorney at SMITH SOVIK KENDRICK & SUGNET PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

COMPLAINT

--none--

SUMMONS

--none--

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Hulslander, K.; Filed: 12/18/2018; Received: 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Hulslander, K.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Hulslander, K.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 05/30/2017; Received: 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less