This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 20:11:44 (UTC).

VASILIKI ROUSSIS - v. - GGP STATEN ISLAND MALL, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 VASILIKI ROUSSIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GGP STATEN ISLAND MALL, LLC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vasiliki Roussis

Defendants

MACY'S RETAIL HOLDINGS, INC.

MACY'S, INC.

GGP STATEN ISLAND MALL, LLC

SCHINDLER ELEVATOR CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORENBLIT, IRINE

Attorney at KORENBLIT & VASSERMAN, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

SONAGERI, JAMES L

Attorney at SONAGERI & FALLON, L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Photos

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Photos; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Medical Records

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Medical Records; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Note of Issue; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - Schindler Elevator Corp

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - Schindler Elevator Corp; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - Macy's Retail Holdings

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - Macy's Retail Holdings; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - GGP

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - GGP; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 08/13/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Photos; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Medical Records; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Note of Issue; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sonageri, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - Schindler Elevator Corp; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - Macy's Retail Holdings; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Serv - GGP; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Korenblit, I.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less