Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:58:31 (UTC).

Van Schaick Luxury Marina & Village, Inc. - v. - City of Cohoes et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Van Schaick Luxury Marina Village, Inc filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against City of Cohoes. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Van Schaick Luxury Marina & Village, Inc.

Defendants

Assessor of the City of Cohoes

City of Cohoes

Board of Assessment Review

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWNE, ERIKA C

Attorney at GOLDMAN ATTORNEYS PLLC

GOLDMAN, PAUL J

Attorney at Goldman Attorneys PLLC

Defendant Attorney

ALMY, STEPHEN MARK

Attorney at The Vincelette Law Firm

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES Verified Statement That Property Is Not Income Producing

STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES Verified Statement That Property Is Not Income Producing; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT entered by the clerk

DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Entered by clerk

ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation & Proposed Order to Consolidate Proceedings

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation & Proposed Order to Consolidate Proceedings; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES Verified Statement That Property Is Not Income Producing; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2019; Received: 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CONSOLIDATION Entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Stipulation & Proposed Order to Consolidate Proceedings; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Almy, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less