This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 23:26:22 (UTC).

VALERIE SHEVELEVA - v. - DAVINDERJIT SINGH et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 VALERIE SHEVELEVA filed an Other lawsuit against DAVINDERJIT SINGH. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Sheveleva

Defendants

Albert Shevelev

Davinderjit Singh

ABBEL CAB CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

INCANTALUPO, THOMAS V

Attorney at THE LAW FIRM MITCHELL & INCANTALUPO

BANILOV, NICK

Attorney at Law offices of Aleksandr Vakarev

Defendant Attorneys

IERVASI, ROCCO

Attorney at James F. Butler & Associates

FELICIONE, LAUREN M.

Attorney at Law Office of Ellen M. Russell

CIMENT, WILLIAM M.

Attorney at Law Office of Ellen M. Russell

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Note of Issue dated 1/27/20

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Note of Issue dated 1/27/20; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Order dated 1/17/20

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Order dated 1/17/20; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Good faith efforts

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Good faith efforts; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Plaintiff deposition transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Plaintiff deposition transcript; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Response to demand dated 8/22/19

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Response to demand dated 8/22/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Demand dated 6/17/19

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Demand dated 6/17/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) NOI Order dated 7/17/19

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) NOI Order dated 7/17/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) NOI Order dated 3/13/19

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) NOI Order dated 3/13/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order dated 10/23/18

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order dated 10/23/18; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: D'Angelica, D.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kiss, M.; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands; Filed By: Kiss, M.; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Banilov, N.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #2) Note of Issue dated 1/27/20; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Order dated 1/17/20; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Good faith efforts; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Plaintiff deposition transcript; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Response to demand dated 8/22/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Demand dated 6/17/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) NOI Order dated 7/17/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) NOI Order dated 3/13/19; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order dated 10/23/18; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Preliminary Conference Order dated 5/23/18; Filed By: Iervasi, R.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: D'Angelica, D.; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kiss, M.; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands; Filed By: Kiss, M.; Filed: 12/15/2017; Received: 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Banilov, N. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Banilov, N.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less