Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:37:26 (UTC).

VALENTINO ASCOLESE - v. - INTERSTATE WASTE SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 VALENTINO ASCOLESE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INTERSTATE WASTE SERVICES. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valentino Ascolese

Defendants

ACTION CARTING ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC

INTERSTATE WASTE SERVICES

Michael J. Sickles

INTERSTATE WASTE SERVICES INC

THE ACTION ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP

SHIELD ENGINEERING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

CAMPBELL, COURTNEY JEAN

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO LLP

Defendant Attorneys

BURKHOFF, JEFFREY M

Attorney at Chesney & Nicholas, LLP

Alterkun, Lindsie Brooke

Attorney at CHESNEY, NICHOLAS & BROWER, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

SUR-REPLY (Motion #1)

SUR-REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Campbell, C.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Alterkun, L.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Dr. Hendler's Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Dr. Hendler's Report; Filed By: Alterkun, L.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUR-REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Campbell, C.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Alterkun, L.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Dr. Hendler's Report; Filed By: Alterkun, L.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Alterkun, L.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Burkhoff, J.; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less