This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:53:46 (UTC).

VALENTINA KUKHARSKAYA - v. - CIRO ARMENINO et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 VALENTINA KUKHARSKAYA filed an Other lawsuit against CIRO ARMENINO. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valentina Kukharskaya

Defendants

Ciro Armenino

Elisabetta Ruotolo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YADGAROV, ALEX M.

Defendant Attorney

VULTAGGIO, TONIANN

Attorney at James G. Bilello & Associates

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) With Affirmation in Support

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) With Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Vultaggio, T. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/06/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/06/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Asnwer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Asnwer; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) PC Order; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Vultaggio, T. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

ORDER - OTHER dated 4/24/19

ORDER - OTHER dated 4/24/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/31/18

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/31/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Yadgarov, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Yadgarov, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 4/24/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 10/31/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/07/2018; Received: 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) PC Order; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Asnwer; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) With Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/06/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2018; Received: 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Yadgarov, A.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Vultaggio, T. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vultaggio, T. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yadgarov, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Yadgarov, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Yadgarov, A. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less