This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 09/24/2021 at 10:42:20 (UTC).

US Bank Trust NA-TR v. Hanna Klein et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 US Bank Trust NA-TR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Hanna Klein. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as trustee of Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-B

US Bank Trust NA-TR

Defendants

Hanna Klein

Yale Property LLC

JOHN DOE #1 through JOHN DOE #12

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

May, Ted E

Attorney at Sheldon May & Associates PC

Defendant Attorney

HASPEL, JOSEPH J

Attorney at JOSEPH J. HASPEL, PLLC

 

Court Documents

ANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant Klein

ANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant Klein; Filed By: Haspel, J.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom john doe #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom john doe #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS YALE PROPERTIES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS YALE PROPERTIES; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HANNA KLEIN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HANNA KLEIN; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Status

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Status; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer of Defendant Klein; Filed By: Haspel, J.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom john doe #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS YALE PROPERTIES; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/18/2021; Received: 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HANNA KLEIN; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Military Status; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: May, T. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less