This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 03/26/2020 at 08:09:43 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF CVI LCF MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I v. PAUL D. STEEN JR. et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF CVI LCF MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAUL D STEEN JR. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0560

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE OF CVI LCF MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Paul d Jr Steen

SEFCU

ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT, LLC. A/P/O ONEMAIN FINANCIAL,

JOHN DOE 1 TO JOHN DOE 25, SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, THE PERSONS OR PARTIES I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DRUCKMAN, STUART L

Attorney at DRUCKMAN LAW GROUP PLLC

ABRAMSON, KEITH L.

Attorney at FRENKEL LAMBERT WEISS WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

SIDERIS, MARIA

Attorney at Druckman Law Group PLLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING FOR RJI

PROOF OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING FOR RJI; Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Abramson, K. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Abramson, K. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sideris, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sideris, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE AFF OF MAILING FOR RJI; Filed By: Druckman, S.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Abramson, K. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Abramson, K. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sideris, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sideris, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Druckman, S. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less