This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:04:29 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., v. MARIE-ALAYNA BYRNES et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 U S BANK TRUST, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIE-ALAYNA BYRNES. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Doris Gonzalez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Doris Gonzalez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

SOLARCITY CORPORATION

Marie-alayna Byrnes AS ADMINISTRATRIX TO THE ESTATE OF MARY ANN PARIS AKA MARY ANN NOIA

George P. Noia AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF MARY ANN PARIS AKA MARY ANN NOIA

SUSTAINABLE NEIGHBORHOODS, LLC

CITY REGISTER OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK,BRONX COUNTY

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

John Doe (Those unknown tenants, occupants, persons or corporations or their heirs, distributees, executors, administrators, trustees, guardians, assignees, creditors or successors claiming an interest in the mortgaged premises.)

KEY BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO KEY BANK USA, N.A., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CHAMPION MORTGAGE CO., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SZCZYGIEL, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

JUREK, AMBER AUGUSTINE

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

SPEREGEN, ADAM BRIAN

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 08/002/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 08/002/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM DATE 5/8/2019.

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM DATE 5/8/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Speregen, A.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE P. NOIA AS HEIR

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE P. NOIA AS HEIR; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE/NO DOES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE/NO DOES; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY REGISTER OF THE CITY OF NY, BRONX COUNTY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY REGISTER OF THE CITY OF NY, BRONX COUNTY; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 08/002/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM DATE 5/8/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Speregen, A.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Jurek, A.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE P. NOIA AS HEIR 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEORGE P. NOIA AS HEIR; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE/NO DOES; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY REGISTER OF THE CITY OF NY, BRONX COUNTY; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szczygiel, C.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less