This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:20:40 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA - v. - HEIRS AT LARGE OF ROSE MARY MCMAHON et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 US BANK TRUST NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HEIRS AT LARGE OF ROSE MARY MCMAHON. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph A Boniello. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ralph A Boniello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

Kevin Mcmahon

HEIRS AT LARGE OF ROSE MARY MCMAHON

Gary Mcmahon

STATE OF NEW YORK

Paul Mcmahon

NEW YORK STATE DEPT OF TAXATION & FINANCE

Rosemary Mcmahon

Brian Mcmahon

Susan Mcmahon

James P Domagalski ESQ

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

David Mcmahon

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE

REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/13/2019; Received: 04/13/2019

TERMS OF SALE

TERMS OF SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/13/2019; Received: 04/13/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/13/2019; Received: 04/13/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) TO EXTEND TIME

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) TO EXTEND TIME; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) ORDER OF DISCHARGE

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) ORDER OF DISCHARGE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SAMANTHA

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SAMANTHA; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SAMANTHA COSGROVE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SAMANTHA COSGROVE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT ROSE MARY MCMAHON A/K/A ROSEMARY A. MCMAHON - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT ROSE MARY MCMAHON A/K/A ROSEMARY A. MCMAHON - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT EUGENE MARTIN MCMAHON - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT EUGENE MARTIN MCMAHON - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Posting; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/13/2019; Received: 04/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTERMS OF SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/13/2019; Received: 04/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 04/13/2019; Received: 04/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) TO EXTEND TIME; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) ORDER OF DISCHARGE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) NOTICE OF ENTRY, JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT EUGENE MARTIN MCHAHON A/K/A EUGENE M. MCMAHON - AMENDED - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SAMANTHA; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SAMANTHA COSGROVE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ROSE MARY MCMAHON A/K/A ROSEMARY A. MCMAHON - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT EUGENE MARTIN MCMAHON - DECEASED - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/10/2017; Received: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less