This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 06/02/2023 at 09:16:45 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA v. ANY UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES DISTRIBUTEES OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF THE LATE JOHN CROCKETT AKA JOHN ADAMS CROCKETT SR IF ANY LIVING AND IF ANY BE DEAD ANY AND ALL PERSONS WHO ARE SPOUSES WIDOWS GRANTEES MORTGAGEES LIENORS HEIR DE

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 US BANK TRUST NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES DISTRIBUTEES OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF THE LATE JOHN CROCKETT AKA JOHN ADAMS CROCKETT SR IF ANY LIVING AND IF ANY BE DEAD ANY AND ALL PERSONS WHO ARE SPOUSES WIDOWS GRANTEES MORTGAGEES LIENORS HEIR DE. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gina C Capone. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gina C Capone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendant

ANY UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES DISTRIBUTEES OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF THE LATE JOHN CROCKETT AKA JOHN ADAMS CROCKETT SR IF ANY LIVING AND IF ANY BE DEAD ANY AND ALL PERSONS WHO ARE SPOUSES WIDOWS GRANTEES MORTGAGEES LIENORS HEIR DEVISEES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINELLI, VICTOR

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 07/12/2021; Received: 07/12/2021

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 07/12/2021; Received: 07/12/2021

HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) *Corrected*

HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)

HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/31/2021; Received: 03/31/2021

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF VACANCY AND ABANDONMENT

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF VACANCY AND ABANDONMENT; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/16/2021; Received: 03/16/2021

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF VACANCY AND ABANDONMENT

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF VACANCY AND ABANDONMENT; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/01/2021; Received: 03/01/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ FOR JUD INTERVEN

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ FOR JUD INTERVEN; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2014; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NTC APPEARANCE & ANSWER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NTC APPEARANCE & ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RESPONSE & DEMANDS

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RESPONSE & DEMANDS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD MAILING

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD SERVICE 2

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD SERVICE 2; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD SERVICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NTC PENDENCY L 77 P 452

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NTC PENDENCY L 77 P 452; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT APPLICATION INDEX NO - TOWN OF KENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT APPLICATION INDEX NO - TOWN OF KENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 07/12/2021; Received: 07/12/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 07/12/2021; Received: 07/12/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketHARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketHARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/07/2021; Received: 04/07/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/31/2021; Received: 03/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF VACANCY AND ABANDONMENT; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/16/2021; Received: 03/16/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF VACANCY AND ABANDONMENT; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/01/2021; Received: 03/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCONSENT TO EFILING WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/14/2020; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
01/08/2014
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2014; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ FOR JUD INTERVEN; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2014; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NTC APPEARANCE & ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RESPONSE & DEMANDS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD SERVICE 2; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFD SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NTC PENDENCY L 77 P 452; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT APPLICATION INDEX NO - TOWN OF KENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2010; Received: 12/14/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less