This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:11:12 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST - v. - VINCENT CAPIZZI et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VINCENT CAPIZZI. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

John Doe (Said name being fictitious to represent unknown Tenants/Occupants of the subject property and any other party or entity of any kind, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortgaged property)

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Vincent Capizzi

AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY, INC.

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

Diane Capizzi

Not Yet Classified

Reliant Court Services Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISBLATT, STACEY ALLYSON

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg

GEORGER, ROLAND RUSSELL

Attorney at Roland R. Georger, Esq.

SCALI, ANTHONY PAUL

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLP

Defendant Attorney

ZUNTAG, MATTHEW STEVEN

Attorney at ZUNTAG & ZUNTAG P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Georger, R.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Georger, R.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance for Defendants

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance for Defendants; Filed By: Zuntag, M.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York State Dept of Taxation and Finance

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York State Dept of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York City Environmental Control Board

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York City Environmental Control Board; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS American Home Equity Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS American Home Equity Inc.; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

AFFIDAVIT 1303 Occupant Mailing Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT 1303 Occupant Mailing Affidavit; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Vincent Capizzi

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Vincent Capizzi; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Spelling Correction of the second borrowers name: Diane Capizzi

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Spelling Correction of the second borrowers name: Diane Capizzi; Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Georger, R.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Georger, R.; Filed: 01/09/2018; Received: 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/22/2017; Received: 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance for Defendants; Filed By: Zuntag, M.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York State Dept of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York City Environmental Control Board; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS American Home Equity Inc.; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303 Occupant Mailing Affidavit; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT No Does Affidavit; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing Affidavit-Vincent Capizzi; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Vincent Capizzi; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Spelling Correction of the second borrowers name: Diane Capizzi; Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scali, A.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less