This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 12:59:40 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST - v. - RICHARD KISTELA et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2018 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICHARD KISTELA. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendants

RICH MARK DAVE LLC

Mark Kistela A/K/A MARK R. KISTELA

Mark R Kistela

INVESTORS SERVICE COMPANY LLC

Pauline Kistela

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Richard Kistela A/K/A RICHARD H. KISTELA

Richard H Kistela

RIVERHEAD BUILDING SUPPLY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHN, MICHAEL HOLLIDAY

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp

BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2018; Received: 06/08/2018

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order of Reference; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 06/08/2018; Received: 06/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohn, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohn, M.; Filed: 05/15/2018; Received: 05/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less