Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:30:51 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST - v. - PATRICK S. DONLON et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PATRICK S DONLON. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

Kristin L. Donlon A/K/A KRISTIN DONLON

Patrick S. Donlon

John Doe (Said name being fictitious to represent unknown Tenants/Occupants of the subject property and any other party or entity of any kind, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortgaged property.)

Not Yet Classified

STERN & EISENBERG, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISBLATT, STACEY ALLYSON

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg

EMERSON, REBECCA FIELD

Attorney at STERN & EISENBERG, P.C.

BALTCH, TODD RYAN

Attorney at Feinstein Raiss Kelin Booker & Goldstein LLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BRITT, KENNETH O

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Emerson, R.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS

CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Emerson, R.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Emerson, R.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doe a/k/a Courtney Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doe a/k/a Courtney Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT Kristin L. Donlon a/k/a Kristin Donjon - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT Kristin L. Donlon a/k/a Kristin Donjon - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kristin L. Donlon a/k/a Kristin Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kristin L. Donlon a/k/a Kristin Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT Patrick S. Donjon - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT Patrick S. Donjon - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Patrick S. Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Patrick S. Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Emerson, R.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS; Filed By: Emerson, R.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Emerson, R.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2018; Received: 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Doe a/k/a Courtney Donjon - 1303B AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doe a/k/a Courtney Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Kristin L. Donlon a/k/a Kristin Donjon - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kristin L. Donlon a/k/a Kristin Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Patrick S. Donjon - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Patrick S. Donjon - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Britt, K. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less