This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 12:32:08 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. LASHAWN LLOYD et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LASHAWN LLOYD. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

Tamara Lloyd

PETRO, INC.

Tandazia Lloyd

Lashawn Lloyd

Salle Lloyd

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

CASE, DAVID P

Attorney at RELIN, GOLDSTEIN & CRANE, L.L.P.

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 9/9/19

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 9/9/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT ADJOURNMENT LETTER

INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT ADJOURNMENT LETTER; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #2) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #2) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) NOTICE OF PENDENCY, SUMMONS & COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) NOTICE OF PENDENCY, SUMMONS & COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A TAMARA LLOYD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A TAMARA LLOYD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PETRO, INC. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PETRO, INC. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT LASHAWN LLOYD - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT LASHAWN LLOYD - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATON OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE - LASHAWN

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATON OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE - LASHAWN; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LASHAWN LLOYD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LASHAWN LLOYD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - LLOYD

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - LLOYD; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2) NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 9/9/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATIONAL STATEMENT ADJOURNMENT LETTER; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #2) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) NOTICE OF PENDENCY, SUMMONS & COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) ORDER DISCONTINUING THE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - TAMARA; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A TAMARA LLOYD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PETRO, INC. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT LASHAWN LLOYD - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATON OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE - LASHAWN; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LASHAWN LLOYD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - LLOYD; Filed By: Case, D. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less