Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 19:53:39 (UTC).

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust - v. - Debra Wilson

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 U S Bank Trust, N A , as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Debra Wilson. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly A O'Connor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kimberly A O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

Defendant

Debra Wilson a/k/a Debra J. Wilson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

MEMORANDUM

MEMORANDUM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE expedited sale on vacant and abandoned property-entered by the clerk

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE expedited sale on vacant and abandoned property-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter and Affidavit of Service

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected* Proposed Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected* Proposed Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE expedited sale on vacant and abandoned property-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2017; Received: 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected* Proposed Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Western District Process Service, LLC; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less