Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:56:00 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST - v. - DONNA R PEEK et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DONNA R PEEK. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4-17

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

Donna R Peek AKA DONNA PEEK, AKA DONNA M. PEEK

George Peek

Olivia Peek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRAUSS, LAURA MARIE

Attorney at Gross Polowy Orlans LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

PUSCHECK, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

CASTER, AUSTIN ROBERT

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY order of vacatur of judgment of foreclosure and sale-entered by the clerk

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY order of vacatur of judgment of foreclosure and sale-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #3) Exhibits A-C

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #3) Exhibits A-C; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

ORDER - OTHER order confirming referee report and judgment of foreclosure and sale-entered by the clerk

ORDER - OTHER order confirming referee report and judgment of foreclosure and sale-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-OLIVIA PEEK AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-OLIVIA PEEK AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-OLIVIA PEEK AS JOHN DOE #2

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-OLIVIA PEEK AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-GEORGE PEEK AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-GEORGE PEEK AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GEORGE PEEK AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GEORGE PEEK AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DONNA R. PEEK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DONNA R. PEEK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY order of vacatur of judgment of foreclosure and sale-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #3) Exhibits A-C; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 04/27/2018; Received: 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER order confirming referee report and judgment of foreclosure and sale-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-O Exhibits A-O Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Strauss, L.; Filed: 02/19/2018; Received: 02/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE/ DONNA R. PEEK AKA DONNA PEEK, AKA DONNA M. PEEK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-OLIVIA PEEK AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-OLIVIA PEEK AS JOHN DOE #2; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-GEORGE PEEK AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GEORGE PEEK AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DONNA R. PEEK; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less