This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:42:42 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. CHRISTOPHER GRIFFIN et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER GRIFFIN. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

Lynelle Griffin

Christopher Griffin

John Doe

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WRAZEN, BRANDON MICHAEL

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Loan Modificaiton Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Loan Modificaiton Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Re-filed Notice of Pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Re-filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Loan Modificaiton Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Re-filed Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less