This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 01/15/2021 at 06:07:23 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. YEFIM ROYZMAN et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against YEFIM ROYZMAN. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Yefim Royzman INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SURVIVING SPOUSE OF IRIMA ROYZMAN

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF LIGHTHOUSE MEWS CONDOMINIUM 1

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF LIGHTHOUSE MEWS CONDO

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIVORSI, CHRISTINA ANN

Attorney at DAY PITNEY LLP

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

Attorney at Calamar

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

AKARAH, AMANIE

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

MOSHE, MICHELLE L

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GATTO, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney at STATE OF NEW YORK OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

KAPLUN, SVETLANA

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SVETLANA KAPLUN, P.C.

FIORE, MARGUERITE ANGELA

Attorney at FIORE LAW FIRM, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance Of Complaint Without Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance Of Complaint Without Prejudice; Filed By: Livorsi, C.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance Of Counterclaims With Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance Of Counterclaims With Prejudice; Filed By: Livorsi, C.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Consenting To Cancellation Of Notice Of Pendency And Affirmation In Support Of Stipulati(..)

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Consenting To Cancellation Of Notice Of Pendency And Affirmation In Support Of Stipulati(..); Filed By: Livorsi, C.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER *Corrected* Stipulation Extending Time To File Reply To Counterclaims

STIPULATION - OTHER *Corrected* Stipulation Extending Time To File Reply To Counterclaims; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation To Adjourn Conference Scheduled For July 11, 2019 To October 17, 2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation To Adjourn Conference Scheduled For July 11, 2019 To October 17, 2019; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fiore, M.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Fiore, M.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Extending Time To Move or File A Reply To Counterclaims

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Extending Time To Move or File A Reply To Counterclaims; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YEFIM ROYZMAN 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YEFIM ROYZMAN 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YEFIM ROYZMAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YEFIM ROYZMAN; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance Of Complaint Without Prejudice; Filed By: Livorsi, C.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Of Discontinuance Of Counterclaims With Prejudice; Filed By: Livorsi, C.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Consenting To Cancellation Of Notice Of Pendency And Affirmation In Support Of Stipulation To Cancel Notice Of Pendency; Filed By: Livorsi, C.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER *Corrected* Stipulation Extending Time To File Reply To Counterclaims; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation To Adjourn Conference Scheduled For July 11, 2019 To October 17, 2019; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fiore, M.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Fiore, M.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Extending Time To Move or File A Reply To Counterclaims; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Extending Time To Move or File A Reply To Counterclaims; Filed By: Moshe, M.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOM OF LIGHTHOUSE MEWS CONDO; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YEFIM ROYZMAN 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YEFIM ROYZMAN; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less