This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 22:34:23 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRSUTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. KEVIN M. JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRSUTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KEVIN M JOHNSON. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1241

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION -TRUSTEE

Defendants

Leslie Benigni-korsa

Kevin M Johnson A/K/A KEVIN JOHNSON

Leslie A Johnson A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA

CHAUTAUQUA COUNTY COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SERVICES

Not Yet Classified

STERN & EISENBERG, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASCINO, MARGARET JAFFE

Attorney at STERN & EISENBERG, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

DAVISON-MARCH, REBECCA L.

Attorney at Chautauqua County Department of Health and Human Services

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WEISBLATT, STACEY ALLYSON

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Davison-March, R.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notices 9-18-19, mailed 8-28-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notices 9-18-19, mailed 8-28-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 9-18-19

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 9-18-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SERVICES OF CHAUTAUQUA COUNTY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SERVICES OF CHAUTAUQUA COUNTY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LESLIE A. JOHNSON A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LESLIE A. JOHNSON A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LESLIE A. JOHNSON A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LESLIE A. JOHNSON A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Loan Modifcation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F Loan Modifcation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Loan Modification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Loan Modification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Recorded Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Recorded Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Davison-March, R.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notices 9-18-19, mailed 8-28-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 9-18-19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SERVICES OF CHAUTAUQUA COUNTY - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LESLIE A. JOHNSON A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LESLIE A. JOHNSON A/K/A LESLIE BENIGNI-KORSA; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G 30 Day Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Loan Modifcation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Loan Modification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Recorded Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less