This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 01:42:56 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - v. - NEIL HAMILTON A/K/A NEIL V. HAMILTON A/K/A NEIL VANCE HAMILTON et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NEIL HAMILTON A/K/A NEIL. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1392

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broome County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

NEIL HAMILTON A/K/A NEIL V. HAMILTON A/K/A NEIL VANCE HAMILTON

CHARTER ONE CREDIT CORPORATION

OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12, REMOVED BY ORDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

SPINNER, MARK DAVID

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BURR & REID

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY JFS

NOTICE OF ENTRY JFS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION NOW DATED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION NOW DATED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 NEIL HAMILTON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 NEIL HAMILTON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VACANCY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VACANCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) and WAIVER IN FORECLOSURE with AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) and WAIVER IN FORECLOSURE with AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY JFS; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conference; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF MOTION NOW DATED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #2) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CITIZENS BANK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 NEIL HAMILTON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VACANCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) and WAIVER IN FORECLOSURE with AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less