This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 04:20:05 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. KUNIGUNDE F. WACHTER et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KUNIGUNDE F WACHTER. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan B Lefkowitz. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joan B Lefkowitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION -NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT' SOLELY AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

MORTGAGEES, LIENORS, HEIRS, DEVISEES, DISTRIBUTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF SUCH OF THEM AS MAY BE DEAD, AND THEIR SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, DISTRIBUTEES AND SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST, ALL OF WHOM AND WHOSE NAMES AND PLAC

Kunigunde F. Wachter ANY UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, DISTRIBUTEES OR SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF THE LATE KUNIGUNDE F. WACHTER A/K/A KUNIGUNDE WACHTER A/K/A KUNIGUNDE FRIEDRICH WACHTER, IF LIVING, AND IF ANY BE DEAD, ANY AND ALL PERSONS WHO ARE SPOUSES, W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGG, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman, LLP

Defendant Attorney

ZEBROWSKI, KATHLEEN A

Attorney at U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U S ATTORNEYS OFFICE

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Rejection Notice of Power of Attorney

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Rejection Notice of Power of Attorney; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Power of Attorney

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Filed by TZM - 20170010

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Filed by TZM - 20170010; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) FILED BY TAM 20170010

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) FILED BY TAM 20170010; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VANCY/NO DOES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VANCY/NO DOES; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Supplemental Summons & Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Supplemental Summons & Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Rejection Notice of Power of Attorney; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Filed by TZM - 20170010; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) FILED BY TAM 20170010; Filed By: Grigg, N.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF VANCY/NO DOES; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/UNITED STATES OF AMERICA BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Supplemental Summons & Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grigg, N. - filed by Closing USA; Filed: 05/18/2017; Received: 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less