This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 00:47:35 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - v. - JILL FADLON et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JILL FADLON. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST 2006-HE1

Defendants

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #12, the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the Subje

Justin Perdomo

FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A.

Jill Fadlon

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

CHASE BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Avraham Cohen A/K/A AVI COHEN

CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CITIBANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

CHRISTOPHER J. CASSAR, PC

COMENITY BANK F/K/A WORLD FINANCIAL NETWORK BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

Attorney at RAS BORISKIN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

SHARARA, ELANA

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON JUSTIN PERDOMO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON JUSTIN PERDOMO; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 JILL FADLON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 JILL FADLON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JILL FADLON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JILL FADLON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Sharara, E.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD- ADAM FADLON AS "JOHN DOE #2"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD- ADAM FADLON AS "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- ADAM FADLON AS "JOHN DOE #2"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- ADAM FADLON AS "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- AVRAHAM COHEN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- AVRAHAM COHEN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHASE BANK USA, NAT'L ASSOC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHASE BANK USA, NAT'L ASSOC.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- CITIBANK, N.A SUCCESSOR BY MERGER CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- CITIBANK, N.A SUCCESSOR BY MERGER CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- COMENITY BANK F/K/A WORLD FINANCIAL NETWORK BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- COMENITY BANK F/K/A WORLD FINANCIAL NETWORK BANK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ON JUSTIN PERDOMO; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 JILL FADLON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JILL FADLON; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Sharara, E.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD ON ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD- ADAM FADLON AS "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- ADAM FADLON AS "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- AVRAHAM COHEN; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHASE BANK USA, NAT'L ASSOC.; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- CITIBANK, N.A SUCCESSOR BY MERGER CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- COMENITY BANK F/K/A WORLD FINANCIAL NETWORK BANK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less