This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 18:01:53 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association v. Jason S. Balestrieri et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 U S Bank National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jason S Balestrieri. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0704

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

Jason S Balestrieri a/k/a Jason s. Balesterieri

Jason S Balesterieri

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION + FINANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CULLY, INGE R.

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-OCCUPANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-OCCUPANT; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-HEATHER BALESTRIERI S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-HEATHER BALESTRIERI S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JASON S. BALESTRIERI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JASON S. BALESTRIERI; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - JASON S. BALESTRIERI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - JASON S. BALESTRIERI; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-HEATHER BALESTRIERI S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-HEATHER BALESTRIERI S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215 - JASON S. BALESTRIERI; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-OCCUPANT; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-HEATHER BALESTRIERI S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-HEATHER BALESTRIERI S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-JASON S. BALESTRIERI; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Provest; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cully, I. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less