This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:14:27 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2018 G-CTT v. BENJAMIN D. GORDEN et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2018 G-CTT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BENJAMIN D GORDEN. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1997

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2018 G-CTT

Defendants

Benjamin D. Gorden

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

POLOWY, AMY E.

HEANEY, ALEXANDRA ROSE

JACOBS, JONATHAN WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

REYNOLDS, RANSOM PRATT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/16/2022; Received: 08/16/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Heaney, A.; Filed: 08/25/2022; Received: 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/16/2022; Received: 08/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 08/11/2022; Received: 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less