This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 17:18:52 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2016-CTT v. RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2016-CTT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RAYMOND D SHRAUGER. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Eugene D Faughnan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0909

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Eugene D Faughnan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2016-CTT

Defendants

Raymond D. Shrauger AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POLOWY, AMY E.

FOURTNER, TRACY MCKAY

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

PASCUZZI, ASHLEY MARIE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/10/2022; Received: 05/10/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/10/2022; Received: 05/10/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/10/2022; Received: 05/10/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 05/27/2022; Received: 05/27/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 05/27/2022; Received: 05/27/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2)

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fourtner, T.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER AOS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAYMOND D. SHRAUGER AKA RAYMOND SHRAUGER 3215; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/02/2022; Received: 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 05/27/2022; Received: 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 05/27/2022; Received: 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/10/2022; Received: 05/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/10/2022; Received: 05/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 05/10/2022; Received: 05/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less