This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 08:50:57 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2016-CTT v. CLAUDETTE SILVERA et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2016-CTT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLAUDETTE SILVERA. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RMAC TRUST, SERIES 2016-CTT

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Walter Silvera

Claudette Silvera

John Doe

KMT ENTERPRISES INC.

GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP LLC

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SERVICES OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK SOCIAL SERVICES DISTRICT

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

KIELICH, MATTHEW ALAN

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

 

Court Documents

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #8

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #8; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #7

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #7; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #6

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #6; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #5

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #5; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- WALTER SILVERA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- WALTER SILVERA; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- CLAUDETTE SILVERA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- CLAUDETTE SILVERA; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING- LATISHA "DOE" (REF LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING- LATISHA "DOE" (REF LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP, LLC; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kielich, M.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #8; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #7; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE DOE (REF NAME) AS JOHN DOE #6; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #5; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE SERVED AS JOHN DOE #4; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- LATISHA DOE (REF LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- WALTER SILVERA; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215- CLAUDETTE SILVERA; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING- LATISHA "DOE" (REF LAST NAME) AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GEMINI CAPITAL GROUP, LLC; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less