This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 16:36:40 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CIM TRUST 2018-R6 MORTGAGE-BACK NOTES SERIES 2018-R6 v. UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY D. KING A/K/A GERRY KING et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CIM TRUST 2018-R6 MORTGAGE-BACK NOTES SERIES 2018-R6 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY D KING A/K/A GERRY KING. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0487

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIM TRUST 2018-R6 MORTGAGE-BACK NOTES SERIES 2018-R6

/trustee U s bank national association

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE PEOPLE OF

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

ALSTAR EMS STARFLIGHT

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION + FINANCE

WCA SERVICES CORPORATION

MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

WCA HOSPITAL

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

GE MONEY BANK

CHAUTAUQUA TOWN COURT CLERK

Timothy King

Robert King

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIMOTHY KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING - AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIMOTHY KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING - AOS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Moran, W.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-TIMOTHY KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-TIMOTHY KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C SCHEDULE A

EXHIBIT(S) - C SCHEDULE A; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING - AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING - AOS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Moran, W.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E SCHEDULE C

EXHIBIT(S) - E SCHEDULE C; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 10-16-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 10-16-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

ANSWER *Corrected* Answer of GAL

ANSWER *Corrected* Answer of GAL; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Waiver of GAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Consent of GAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER *Corrected* Answer of GAL; Filed By: Boriskin, S.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-TIMOTHY KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ROBERT KING AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE OF THE ESTATE OF GERRY KING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-CLERK OF CHAUTAQUA TOWN COURT OBO PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MIDLAND FUNDING LLC S/H/A MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN NEW YORK AS MIDLAND FUNDING OF DELAWARE; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Bernard, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, L.L.C. S/H/A ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES. LLC A/P/O GE MONEY BANK; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Bernard, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - W.C.A. SERVICES CORPORATION S/H/A WCA SERVICES CORPORATION D/B/A ALSTAR EMS STARFLIGHT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Bernard, A.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C SUMMONS & COMPLAINT EXHIBIT C - COUNTY JUDGMENT(S) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B SUMMONS & COMPLAINT EXHIBIT B - MORTGAGE(S) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A SUMMONS & COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A - NOTE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less